Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 04/25/2020 at 18:04:22 (UTC).

Gonzalez, Dianelis VS Rodriguez Cantero, Armando

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 Gonzalez, Dianelis filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Rodriguez Cantero, Armando. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gonzalez, Dianelis

Respondent

Rodriguez Cantero, Armando

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2019-10-17 Instrument# 5778962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Final Hearing for Uncontested Dissolution (to be heard at 930am)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketPresent: Armando Rodriguez Cantero (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketPresent: Dianelis Gonzalez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketProceeding: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSet on Simplified/Name Changes/UCD docket 10/16/2019 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketOrder Setting Uncontested Final Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Rodriguez Cantero, Armando, issue date 11/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Gonzalez, Dianelis, issue date 01/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status & Determination, Is Indigent: Yes, Gonzalez, Dianelis (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2019-10-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with No Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Due Date: 2019-09-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less