This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 04/06/2020 at 05:14:20 (UTC).

Garcia, Eneheidys VS Rizo Rubio, Yampier

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Garcia, Eneheidys filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Rizo Rubio, Yampier. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Garcia, Eneheidys

Respondent

Rizo Rubio, Yampier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Simplified Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2019-10-30 Instrument# 5783756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD; Location: Naples; Room: SHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketPresent: Yampier Rizo Rubio (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketPresent: Eneheidys Garcia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Cupp, Scott H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProceeding: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDisclosure From Non Lawyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status & Determination, Is Indigent: Yes, Garcia, Eneheidys (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Corroborating Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Garcia, Eneheidys, issue date 12/20/1997

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketSet on Simplified/Name Changes/UCD docket 10/30/2019 beginning at 9:00 AM Cupp, Scott H (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2019-10-30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Simplified Dissolution of Marriage; Due Date: 2019-10-07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Final Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketPetition for Simplified Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketSimplified Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less