This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/16/2022 at 14:51:11 (UTC).

Foxwood Of Foxfire Condominium Iii Association Inc VS All Other Occupants Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Foxwood Of Foxfire Condominium Iii Association Inc filed an Other lawsuit against All Other Occupants. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin, Janeice T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Martin, Janeice T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foxwood Of Foxfire Condominium Iii Association Inc

Defendants

All Other Occupants

South Bay Holding Group Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simons, Diane Marie

Defendant Attorney

Rinaldi, Thomas Kenneth

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

01/29/2021: Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

01/29/2021: Complaint

Designation of E-Mail Address

01/29/2021: Designation of E-Mail Address

Summons issued

01/29/2021: Summons issued

Summons issued

01/29/2021: Summons issued

Paid $320.00 on receipt 1165651, Fully Paid

02/01/2021: Paid $320.00 on receipt 1165651, Fully Paid

Return of Non-Service

02/16/2021: Return of Non-Service

Return of Service of Summons on South Bay Holding Group Llc,, served 02/15/2021

02/16/2021: Return of Service of Summons on South Bay Holding Group Llc,, served 02/15/2021

Motion for Clerk's Default

03/08/2021: Motion for Clerk's Default

Default issued by clerk on South Bay Holding Group Llc

03/11/2021: Default issued by clerk on South Bay Holding Group Llc

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal South Bay Holding Group Llc, All Other Occupants

03/30/2021: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal South Bay Holding Group Llc, All Other Occupants

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal South Bay Holding Group Llc, All Other Occupants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault issued by clerk on South Bay Holding Group Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Clerk's Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on South Bay Holding Group Llc,, served 02/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $320.00 on receipt 1165651, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialCounty Civil Claim > $2500 to $15,000; Amount Due: $300.0; Amount Paid: $300.0; Due Date: 2021-02-01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of E-Mail Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCounty Civil >$8,000 - $15,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • ChargeCourt Action: Dismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2021-03-30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-02-01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-02-01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less