This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 11/17/2021 at 08:29:08 (UTC).

Fineberg, Amy VS Rosenbluth, Steven M

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Fineberg, Amy filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Rosenbluth, Steven M. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Kyle S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Kyle S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fineberg, Amy

Respondent

Rosenbluth, Steven M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vogelsang, Beth Tyler

Attorney at Henderson Franklin Starnes & Holt Pa

8889 Pelican Bay Blvd Ste 400

Naples, FL 34108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2021-06-03 Instrument# 6070625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: KSC; Notes: Final Hearing @ 2:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketStand in Attorney Iman Zekri for Attorney Beth Vogelsang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPresent: Steven M Rosenbluth (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPresent: Amy Fineberg (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Cohen, Kyle S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProceeding: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketChild Support Guidelines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketUCD Checklist - Dissolution of Marriage Case

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2021-06-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-04-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Vogelsang, Beth Tyler for Amy Fineberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vogelsang, Beth Tyler