Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/10/2021 at 01:01:14 (UTC).

Elite Cabinetry Inc VS Build Llc Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Elite Cabinetry Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Build Llc. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin, Janeice T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Martin, Janeice T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elite Cabinetry Inc

Defendants

Us Specialty Insurance Company

Build Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Slack, Mark Alan

Attorney at Woods Weidermiller Michetti & Rudnick Pllc

9045 Strada Stell Ct Ste 400

Naples, FL 341094438

Defendant Attorneys

Brown, Benjamin Bruce

Attorney at Quarles & Brady L L P

1395 Panther Ln Ste 300

Naples, FL 341097875

Hazelbaker, Elizabeth Anne

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

1395 Panther Ln Ste 300

Naples, FL 341097875

Vander Velde, Jessica Kay

Attorney at Quarles & Brady Llp

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 336025195

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

01/27/2021: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Request for Production

11/23/2020: Request for Production

Answer and Counterclaim for Circuit Court

11/20/2020: Answer and Counterclaim for Circuit Court

Notice of Compliance with Request for Copies

11/11/2020: Notice of Compliance with Request for Copies

Return of Service of Summons on Build Llc,, served 08/13/2020

10/08/2020: Return of Service of Summons on Build Llc,, served 08/13/2020

Motion to Dismiss by Build Llc

09/02/2020: Motion to Dismiss by Build Llc

Return of Service of Summons on Us Specialty Insurance Company,, served 08/12/2020

08/13/2020: Return of Service of Summons on Us Specialty Insurance Company,, served 08/12/2020

Paid $420.00 on receipt 1127842, Fully Paid

08/07/2020: Paid $420.00 on receipt 1127842, Fully Paid

Summons issued

08/06/2020: Summons issued

Response to Request for Production

11/09/2020: Response to Request for Production

Complaint, Amended

10/28/2020: Complaint, Amended

Notice of Compliance with Request for Copies

10/20/2020: Notice of Compliance with Request for Copies

Request for Copies

10/16/2020: Request for Copies

Return of Service of Subpoena

10/14/2020: Return of Service of Subpoena

Return of Service of Subpoena

10/14/2020: Return of Service of Subpoena

Judicial Notes In Lieu of Clerks Minutes

10/12/2020: Judicial Notes In Lieu of Clerks Minutes

Notice of Hearing for Motion To Dismiss Complaint

09/10/2020: Notice of Hearing for Motion To Dismiss Complaint

Summons issued

08/06/2020: Summons issued

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Counterclaim by Elite Cabinetry Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance with Request for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $400.00 on receipt 1149924, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • ChargeCount: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil General; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2020-11-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Counterclaim for Circuit Court

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $420.00 on receipt 1127842, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Claim > $15,000 to $30,0000; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2020-08-07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCounty Civil > $15,000 - $30,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-08-07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-08-07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JNR Builders, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Slack, Mark Alan