Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 11:51:08 (UTC).

Eckhardt, Christa Louise VS Eckhardt, Robert Patrick

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Eckhardt, Christa Louise filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Eckhardt, Robert Patrick. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eckhardt, Christa Louise

Respondent

Eckhardt, Robert Patrick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2020-06-04 Instrument# 5875240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketChange of Address for Eckhardt, Robert Patrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MD; Notes: Final Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOrder Setting Hearing And Requiring Electronic Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketChange of Address for Eckhardt, Christa Louise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAffidavit in Compliance with Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Eckhardt, Christa Louise, issue date 10/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-06-03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet For Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $75.0; Balance: $333.0; Due Date: 2020-06-06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less