Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 17:35:26 (UTC).

Dacosta Pereira, Natasha VS Josie, Daniel

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 Dacosta Pereira, Natasha filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Josie, Daniel. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cupp, Scott H and Cohen, Kyle S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cupp, Scott H

Cohen, Kyle S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dacosta Pereira, Natasha

Respondent

Josie, Daniel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketPer Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Cohen, Kyle S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Parenting Coordinator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketReceipt Number 1108087 had a refund of $50.00 amount sent to Holly B. Chernoff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMotion to Appoint Parenting Coordinator - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Paternity Recorded 2020-02-13 Instrument# 5828294

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPaid $300.00 on receipt 1086183, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Family Special; Amount Due: $300.0; Amount Paid: $300.0; Due Date: 2020-01-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence to Clerk, from Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer by Daniel Josie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketAffidavit in Compliance with Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-02-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketStanding Order - Paternity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPetition to Determine Paternity, Child Support & Other Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPaternity

    Read MoreRead Less