This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 17:18:05 (UTC).

Cornacchia, Dominick Austin VS Rambosk, Kevin J Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Cornacchia, Dominick Austin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rambosk, Kevin J. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Hugh D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Hugh D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornacchia, Dominick Austin

Defendants

Rambosk, Kevin J

SHERIFF OF COLLIER COUNTY FLORIDA IN HIS OFFICAL CAPACITY AS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fowler, Mary A

Defendant Attorney

Boltrek III, William

 

Court Documents

Standing Order - Circuit

10/19/2020: Standing Order - Circuit

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

11/11/2020: Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Return of Service of Subpoena

02/18/2021: Return of Service of Subpoena

Response to Request for Production

01/07/2021: Response to Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

11/25/2020: Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

01/07/2021: Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

Return of Service of Subpoena

02/22/2021: Return of Service of Subpoena

Return of Service of Subpoena

02/16/2021: Return of Service of Subpoena

Request for Production

11/11/2020: Request for Production

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAuto Negligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-10-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint with Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less