Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 05:17:25 (UTC).

Cineus, Yves Harold VS Petilord, Wadley

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Cineus, Yves Harold filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Petilord, Wadley. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cohen, Kyle S and McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cohen, Kyle S

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cineus, Yves Harold

Respondent

Petilord, Wadley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Castro II, Jason Kenneth

Attorney at Golden Gate Legal Center

11725 Collier Blvd Ste F

Naples, FL 34116

Respondent Attorney

Fraser, Jason Wentworth

Attorney at Family First Legal Group

2950 Immokalee Rd Ste 2

Naples, FL 34110

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMotion to Amend Pleadings - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Castro II, Jason Kenneth for Yves Harold Cineus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Class by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Petilord, Wadley, served 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPaid $392.50 on receipt 1175722, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketUnified Family Court Reassignment to McGowan, John O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • ChargeCount: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPaid $408.00 on receipt 1173411, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Cineus, Yves Harold, issue date 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2021-03-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Castro II, Jason Kenneth