Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 19:05:50 (UTC).

Carvelli, Francesco VS Garcia, Karen C

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 Carvelli, Francesco filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Garcia, Karen C. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carvelli, Francesco

Respondent

Garcia, Karen C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Silverio, Mark Vincent

Attorney at Silverio & Hall PA

255 8Th St S

Naples, FL 341026123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2020-02-26 Instrument# 5834073

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Final Judgment For Dissolution Of Marriage @ 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPresent: Francesco Carvelli (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProceeding: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 2/25/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing for Final Judgment For Dissolution Of Marriage @ 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketUCD Checklist - Dissolution of Marriage Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer by Karen C Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with No Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silverio, Mark Vincent