Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 13:22:33 (UTC).

Carter, Jennifer Ann VS Carter, Garth

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Carter, Jennifer Ann filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Carter, Garth. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carter, Jennifer Ann

Respondent

Carter, Garth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tarnow, Ryan Maximillian

Attorney at Tarnow & Associates Family Lawyers Pllc

5150 Tamiami Trail North Suite 207

Naples, FL 34103

Respondent Attorney

Brown, Christopher Hayden

Attorney at Brown, Suarez & Rios, Pa

265 E Marion Ave Unit 114

Punta Gorda, FL 339503715

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Domestic Violence Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: SHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Domestic Violence Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: SHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketSet on Domestic Violence Hearing docket 3/23/2020 beginning at 1:30 PM Cupp, Scott H (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCancelled Domestic Violence Hearing on 9/23/2019 1:30:00 PM due to Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCancelled Domestic Violence Hearing on 3/23/2020 1:30:00 PM due to Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: Domestic Violence Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: SHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder Resetting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketContinued to 3/23/2020 1:30 PM Domestic Violence Hearing Cupp, Scott H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketAttorney Present Brown, Christopher Hayden (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketTemporary Injunction for Protection Against Domestic Violence With Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketAffidavit in Compliance with Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketSet on Domestic Violence Hearing docket 9/9/2019 beginning at 1:30 PM Cupp, Scott H (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketPetition for Injunction for Protection Against Domestic Violence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketUnified Family Court Reassignment to Cupp, Scott H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketInformation on Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketInformation on Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDomestic Violence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketInformation on Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less