This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/17/2022 at 08:02:14 (UTC).

Capes, Daniel K, Dekko, C E Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Capes, Daniel K, Dekko, C E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodie, Lauren L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brodie, Lauren L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

Dekko, C E

Not Yet Classified

Marinelli, Paige Dekko

Capes, Daniel K

Dekko, C E

DEKKO, PAIGE ELISE

Inphynet Contarction Srv Llc

Phillips & Cohen Associates Ltd

COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS ON BEHALF OF

Southwest Florida Emergency Management Llc

Decedent

Dekko, Chase Erikson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Capes, Daniel Karl

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketOrder Extending Time to File Petition of Discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketPetition to Extend Time for Discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Claim of Southwest Florida Emergency Management Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Claim of Southwest Florida Emergency Management Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Claim of Phillips And Cohen Associates Ltd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketStatement of Claim from Southwest Florida Emergency Management Llc $1,358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketStatement of Claim from Southwest Florida Emergency Management Llc C/O Dcm Services $7,341.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketStatement Regarding Creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPaid $400.00 on receipt 1170152, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialProbate Filing Fee $400; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2021-02-18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration Testate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProbate - Formal/Ancillary/Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Notice of Administration signed by Paige Dekko Marinelli

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative & Designation of Resident Agent & Acceptance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less