This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 06:00:46 (UTC).

Burkhart Resource Limited Partnership Et Al VS Arthrex Inc

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 Burkhart Resource Limited Partnership filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Arthrex Inc. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Hugh D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Hugh D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Burkhart Resource Limited Partnership

Burkhart, Stephen

Defendants

Arthrex Inc

Schmieding, Reinhold

Counter Defendant

Burkhart Md, Stephen S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Waggoner, Dennis Parker

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson

Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601-2231

Dauchot, Luke L

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

555 S Flower St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rotman, Anna

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

609 Main St

Houston, TX 77002

Donovan, Edward C

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

655 15Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Young, Kenneth

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

609 Main St

Houston, TX 77002

Corso, Michael Joseph

Attorney at Henderson Franklin Starnes & Holt Pa

Po Box 280

Fort Myers, FL 33902-0280

Criser, Mark Johnson

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson

101 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Lawless, Christopher

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

555 S Flower St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Singh, Justin

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

555 S Flower St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Korn, Jason Hunter

Attorney at Dentons Cohen & Grigsby, P.C.

9110 Strada Pl Ste 6200

Naples, FL 34108-2396

Bender, Marshall

Attorney at Dentons Cohen & Grigsby Pc

9110 Strada Pl Ste 6200

Naples, FL 34108-2396

Vance, Geoffrey

Attorney at Perkins Coie Llp

131 S Dearborn St Ste 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Smith, Mark T

Attorney at Perkins Coie Llp

131 S Dearborn St Ste 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Sawyer, Douglas L

Attorney at Perkins Coie Llp

131 S Dearborn St Ste 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Nelson, Stephanie J

Attorney at Perkins Coie Llp

131 S Dearborn St Ste 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Conklin Baines, Erica Leanne

Attorney at Dentons Cohen & Grigsby Pc

9110 Strada Pl

Naples, FL 34108

 

Court Documents

Order for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice

04/30/2020: Order for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice

Notice of Hearing for Motion For Entry Of Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality And To Compel Production Of Documents @ 3Pm

10/29/2020: Notice of Hearing for Motion For Entry Of Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality And To Compel Production Of Documents @ 3Pm

Paid $395.00 on receipt 1108840, Fully Paid

04/29/2020: Paid $395.00 on receipt 1108840, Fully Paid

Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice -

03/12/2020: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice -

Motion for Extension of Time - Stipulation

01/08/2021: Motion for Extension of Time - Stipulation

Exhibit List

01/29/2021: Exhibit List

Response to Request for Production

07/16/2020: Response to Request for Production

Request for Production

06/16/2020: Request for Production

Objection to Notice of Production

01/08/2021: Objection to Notice of Production

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: HDH; Notes: Motion For Summary Judgment And Case Management. 10:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExpert Witness Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExpert Witness Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: HDH; Notes: Motion For Entry Of Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality And To Compel Production Of Documents @ 3Pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: HDH; Notes: Motion For Entry Of Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality And To Compel Production Of Documents @ 3Pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents- Denied as long as Defendant starts Rolling Production by April 1st 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAttorney Kristin Diaz-Garcia Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAttorney Erica Baines Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
197 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Pro Hac Vice; Amount Due: $100.0; Amount Paid: $100.0; Due Date: 2020-02-07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Pro Hac Vice; Amount Due: $100.0; Amount Paid: $100.0; Due Date: 2020-02-07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-02-07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint & Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less