Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 04/18/2020 at 01:07:02 (UTC).

Buddu, Pavitra Priyadarshini VS Buddu, Purushotham R

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 Buddu, Pavitra Priyadarshini filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Buddu, Purushotham R. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Buddu, Pavitra Priyadarshini

Respondents

Buddu, Purushotham R

Buddu, Purushotham Reddy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Holley, David William

Attorney at Bruandt Adamski Feichthaler & Sanches Pllc

1714 Cape Coral Pkwy E

Cape Coral, FL 33904

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2019-12-20 Instrument# 5806169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Final Hearing At 9:05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney Present Holley, David William (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketPresent: Pavitra Priyadarshini Buddu (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketProceeding: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 12/18/2019 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing for Final Hearing At 9:05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Simplified/Name Changes/UCD; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAcceptance of Service of Process for Buddu, Purushotham R served 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Buddu, Pavitra P, issue date 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Class by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketChild Support Guidelines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMotion to Deviate from Child Support Guidelines -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketParenting Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAffidavit in Compliance with Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less