Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 05:34:52 (UTC).

Bracken, James Christopher VS Bracken, Susan Elizabeth

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Bracken, James Christopher filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Bracken, Susan Elizabeth. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bracken, James Christopher

Respondent

Bracken, Susan Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Simplified Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2020-01-23 Instrument# 5819022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPresent: Susan Elizabeth Bracken (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPresent: James Christopher Bracken (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProceeding: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPaid $415.00 on receipt 1079402, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: $7.0; Amount Paid: $7.0; Due Date: 2019-12-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Bracken, Susan Elizabeth, issue date 11/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSet on Simplified/Name Changes/UCD docket 1/23/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-01-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Final Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPetition for Simplified Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Simplified Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2019-12-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSimplified Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less