Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 10:36:28 (UTC).

Biswurm, Crystal Gayle VS Biswurm Sr, Timothy Patrick

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 Biswurm, Crystal Gayle filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Biswurm Sr, Timothy Patrick. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cupp, Scott H and Cohen, Kyle S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cupp, Scott H

Cohen, Kyle S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Biswurm, Crystal Gayle

Respondent

Biswurm Sr, Timothy Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lanier, Suzanne D

Attorney at Ross Lanier and Deifik P A

599 Ninth Street N Ste 300

Naples, FL 341025624

Respondent Attorneys

Hamisch, Alan F

Attorney at The Hamisch Law Firm, PLLC

501 Goodlette-Frank Rd Suite A210

Naples, FL 34102

Hall, Cynthia Byrne

Attorney at Silverio & Hall P.A.

255 8Th St S

Naples, FL 341026123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2020-11-19 Instrument# 5956361

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: KSC; Notes: Final Hearing @ 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAttorney Present Lanier, Suzanne D (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketPresent: Crystal Gayle Biswurm (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Cohen, Kyle S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProceeding: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 11/18/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM Cohen, Kyle S (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing for Final Hearing @ 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-11-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-02-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Military Service for Biswurm, Timothy P Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Lanier, Suzanne D for Crystal Biswurm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hall, Cynthia Byrne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hamisch, Alan F