Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twetntieth Circuit Courts - Collier County on 07/15/2021 at 05:47:53 (UTC).

Belesis, Maria Et Al VS Asi Preferred Insurance Corp

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Belesis, Maria filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp. This case was filed in Twetntieth Circuit Courts - Collier County, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Hugh D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Twetntieth Circuit Courts - Collier County

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Hugh D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Belesis, Maria

Belesis, Padelis

Defendant

Asi Preferred Insurance Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pimental, Luis

Attorney at Kanner & Pintaluga Pa

925 S Federal Hwy 6Th Fl

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

Haas, Raymond A

Attorney at Hd Law Partners

Po Box 23567

Tampa, FL 336233567

Perotti, A. Michael

Attorney at Hd Law Partners

Post Office Box 23567

Tampa, FL 33623

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

06/16/2021: Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

06/08/2021: Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

Motion for Extension of Time -

05/17/2021: Motion for Extension of Time -

Answer and Affirmative Defense by Asi Preferred Insurance Corp with Demand for Jury Trial

05/17/2021: Answer and Affirmative Defense by Asi Preferred Insurance Corp with Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by Asi Preferred Insurance Corp

04/27/2021: Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by Asi Preferred Insurance Corp

Summons issued

03/29/2021: Summons issued

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

03/29/2021: Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

03/29/2021: Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/29/2021: Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

06/08/2021: Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Extension of Time -

05/20/2021: Motion for Extension of Time -

Request for Production

04/20/2021: Request for Production

Notice of Service of Process by Chief Financial Officer for Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, on 04/05/2021

04/05/2021: Notice of Service of Process by Chief Financial Officer for Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, on 04/05/2021

Paid $410.00 on receipt 1180655, Fully Paid

03/30/2021: Paid $410.00 on receipt 1180655, Fully Paid

Standing Order - Circuit

03/29/2021: Standing Order - Circuit

Designation of E-Mail Address

03/29/2021: Designation of E-Mail Address

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/29/2021: Notice of Taking Deposition

Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

03/29/2021: Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense by Asi Preferred Insurance Corp with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint/Petition - by Asi Preferred Insurance Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEROTTI , A. MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAAS, RAYMOND A