This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County on 03/18/2022 at 12:51:49 (UTC).

Audi Financial Services VS Alice, Meir Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Audi Financial Services filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against Alice, Meir. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Hugh D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Hugh D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Audi Financial Services

Defendants

Alice, Robyn

Expo Painting And Contracting Llc

Alice, Meir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bloch, Bruce Eric

Attorney at Sapurstein & Bloch, P.A.

9700 S Dixie Hwy Ste 1000

Miami, FL 331562865

 

Court Documents

Return of Service of Summons on Alice, Robyn, served 06/23/2021

06/30/2021: Return of Service of Summons on Alice, Robyn, served 06/23/2021

Default issued by clerk on Robyn Alice

07/21/2021: Default issued by clerk on Robyn Alice

Motion for Clerk's Default

07/16/2021: Motion for Clerk's Default

Summons issued

06/11/2021: Summons issued

Order Vacating Dismissal Recorded 2021-06-01 Instrument# 6068683

05/28/2021: Order Vacating Dismissal Recorded 2021-06-01 Instrument# 6068683

Return of Non-Service

06/08/2021: Return of Non-Service

Affidavit Of Military Service For Alice, Meir

07/16/2021: Affidavit Of Military Service For Alice, Meir

Return of Service of Summons on Expo Painting And Contracting Llc,, served 06/23/2021

06/30/2021: Return of Service of Summons on Expo Painting And Contracting Llc,, served 06/23/2021

Certificate of Service

08/06/2021: Certificate of Service

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Default Judgment on Expo Painting And Contracting Llc, Alice, Robyn, Alice, Meir Recorded 2021-08-06 Instrument# 6108423

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Default Judgment -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault issued by clerk on Meir Alice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault issued by clerk on Robyn Alice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault issued by clerk on Expo Painting And Contracting Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Clerk's Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Military Service For Alice, Meir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Clerk's Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Military Service for Alice, Robyn

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOther Circuit Civil Writ of Replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Expo Painting And Contracting Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where AUDI FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUCE E BLOCH, ESQ