This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/18/2022 at 14:10:46 (UTC).

Anchel, Edward, Anchel, Edward Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Anchel, Edward, Anchel, Edward was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodie, Lauren L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brodie, Lauren L

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified, Petitioners and Trustees

Anchel, Edward

Capes, Daniel K

Gruber, Steven R

Feidel, Allison M

Bessemer Trust Company Of Florida

Decedent

Anchel, Judith G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

Capes, Daniel Karl

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Notice of Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketInventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPaid $27.00 on receipt 1231415, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: $27.0; Amount Paid: $27.0; Due Date: 2021-11-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketLetters of Administration - Amended Recorded 2021-10-29 Instrument# 6151770

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Set Aside Order Admitting Will and/or Letters of Administration Recorded 2021-10-29 Instrument# 6151761

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketPetition to Appoint Successor Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Priority, Consent to Appointment of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration Testate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProbate - Formal/Ancillary/Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialProbate Filing Fee $41; Amount Due: $41.0; Amount Paid: $41.0; Due Date: 2021-03-24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Notice of Administration signed by Edward Anchel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative & Designation of Resident Agent & Acceptance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less