This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/16/2022 at 11:36:01 (UTC).

Alexander Jr, James C, Alexander, Elise Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Alexander Jr, James C, Alexander, Elise was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Yet Classified and Trustee

The Northern Trust Company

Not Yet Classified and Trustees

Alexander, Elise

Cochrane, Beverleigh

Alexander, Kathy Lynne

West, Sarah

University Of Arkansas Fort Smith Foundation Inc

North Naples United Methodist Church

The Northern Trust Company

ALEXANDER, MARY ELISE

West III, Robert Irvin

Bost Foundation Inc

Alexander, John D

Quality Life Associates Inc

First United Methodist Chrurch

Cochrane, Hunter

Gilliam, Terryl N

Crumpler, Charles Richard

Moore, Mary Margaret West

Tenney, Weston Edward

Girls Inc Of Fort Smith

Decedent

Alexander Jr, James C

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Capes, Daniel Karl

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketInventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Claim of The Moorings Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Extending Time to File Inventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPetition to Extend Time to File Inventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Federal Estate Tax Return Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPaid $36.00 on receipt 1211186, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialProbate Service Charges; Amount Due: $36.0; Amount Paid: $36.0; Due Date: 2021-08-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketStatement Regarding Creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialProbate Filing Fee $400; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2021-01-13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration Testate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProbate - Formal/Ancillary/Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialProbate Filing Fee $41; Amount Due: $41.0; Amount Paid: $41.0; Due Date: 2021-01-13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Notice of Administration signed by The Northern Trust Company As Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOath of Corporate Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less