This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 18:10:41 (UTC).

State of Florida vs.Nuss, Dawn Marie

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 State of Florida filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nuss, Dawn Marie. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

NUSS, DAWN MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ANTHONY, JOSEPH D III

RIPPEON, ANDY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION/SUCCESSFUL

6/17/2020: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION/SUCCESSFUL

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/27/2020 10:51 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020004468

1/21/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/27/2020 10:51 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020004468

SURETY BOND RELEASE

1/21/2020: SURETY BOND RELEASE

PAYMENT $305.00 RECEIPT #19624

1/21/2020: PAYMENT $305.00 RECEIPT #19624

ORDER MODIFYING BOND-PRE TRIAL RELEASE

11/18/2019: ORDER MODIFYING BOND-PRE TRIAL RELEASE

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/29/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/1/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/1/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

8/30/2019: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

8/20/2019: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

7/19/2019: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

7/18/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

7/3/2019: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

6/25/2019: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

6/17/2019: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

6/14/2019: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

6/14/2019: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC MONITORINIG AND ORDER SETTING BOND

6/13/2019: ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC MONITORINIG AND ORDER SETTING BOND

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION/SUCCESSFUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: TRANSFERRED TO 2020PB000053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: MISDEMEANOR RAPE CRISIS TRUST FUND ASSESSED $151.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: MISDEMEANOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SURCHARGE ASSESSED $201.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: CONTEMPT OF COURT - VIOL INJUNCTION STALKING (784.0487(4)(a)); Degree: 1; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/27/2020 10:51 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020004468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE-NO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: CLAY COUNTY JAIL 15,003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC MONITORINIG AND ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIPPEON, ANDY