This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 06/17/2021 at 18:38:05 (UTC).

State of Florida vs.Absher, Doffis Ray, Jr.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 State of Florida filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Absher, Doffis Ray, Jr. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SKINNER, JOHN H. and LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0372

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SKINNER, JOHN H.

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOUGHREY, MICHAEL

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ABSHER, DOFFIS RAY JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGEE, PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

HAMPTON, KELLY B

SANFORDSOLES, BRITNEY

 

Court Documents

Surety Bond Release

10/24/2018: Surety Bond Release

Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

8/29/2018: Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

6/19/2018: Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

5/8/2018: Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

4/11/2018: Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

Notice to Appear

3/21/2018: Notice to Appear

Affidavit for Arrest Warrant

3/21/2018: Affidavit for Arrest Warrant

Notice Of Appearance

9/24/2018: Notice Of Appearance

Arrest Warrant

3/21/2018: Arrest Warrant

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE

6/4/2020: MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE

NOTICE TO APPEAR

5/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

5/5/2020: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

NOTICE OF FILING AND RETURN OF SERVICE

3/18/2020: NOTICE OF FILING AND RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING AND RETURN OF SERVICE

3/18/2020: NOTICE OF FILING AND RETURN OF SERVICE

ORDER - INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

12/5/2019: ORDER - INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

ORDER - INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

12/5/2019: ORDER - INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

MOTION (GENERIC) FOR ENTRY OF INCOME DEDUCTION ORDERS PER FLORIDA STATUTE

11/26/2019: MOTION (GENERIC) FOR ENTRY OF INCOME DEDUCTION ORDERS PER FLORIDA STATUTE

Motion to Compel

7/9/2019: Motion to Compel

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT TO REINSTATE DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $337.00 RECEIPT #43958

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING VICTIM'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO GIBSON, MICHAEL BRAD; PONTIERI, THERESA MARIE CARLI ESQ REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CF000372, STATE OF FLORIDA VS.ABSHER, DOFFIS RAY, JR. WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS ORDR-6/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF THERESA CARLI PONTIERI, ESG TO ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS ON BEHALD OF VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: Motion Hearing; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice Of Appearance Kelly B. Hampton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Information Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice Of Ct Date Returned By Post Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Arrest and Booking Report from Jax Sheriff Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGEE, PATRICK