This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/11/2021 at 19:24:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WILLIAMS, ANN MARGARET

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, ANN MARGARET. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. and SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1133

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, ANN MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COGDILL, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

8/3/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW

8/4/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW

VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

8/3/2020: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

ORDER OF BOND

8/3/2020: ORDER OF BOND

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

8/3/2020: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BURGL - WITH ASSAULT OR BATTERY (810.02(2)(a)); Degree: 1; Level: F; Disposition: Transfer to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: TRANSFERRED TO 2020MM001904

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAWAL AND APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Division C Chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF001133

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COGDILL, JENNIFER