This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 02:14:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TEIXEIRA, DAVID JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TEIXEIRA, DAVID JAMES. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0095

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TEIXEIRA, DAVID JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

SIKES, CHARLES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $151.00 RECEIPT #42021

7/6/2020: PAYMENT $151.00 RECEIPT #42021

PAYMENT $201.00 RECEIPT #42020

7/6/2020: PAYMENT $201.00 RECEIPT #42020

NOTICE TO APPEAR

7/6/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ORDER OF BOND

7/2/2020: ORDER OF BOND

AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION

6/26/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION

SURETY BOND RELEASE

6/9/2020: SURETY BOND RELEASE

NOTICE TO APPEAR

5/21/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

4/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

3/4/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/4/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

2/27/2020: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

2/27/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILIBILITY

2/11/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILIBILITY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/4/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

1/27/2020: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

1/14/2020: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/14/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DISMISSING AFFIDAVIT AND CONTINUING PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment VOP; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online; Result: OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $325.50 RECEIPT #42022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $151.00 RECEIPT #42021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $201.00 RECEIPT #42020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN FOR VOP/VIOLATION OF COMMUNITY CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Division D Chambers; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM000095

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant