This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 13:14:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SANTIAGO, KALEB AARON

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SANTIAGO, KALEB AARON. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0114

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SANTIAGO, KALEB AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND RELEASE

6/9/2020: SURETY BOND RELEASE

DIVERSIONARY PROGRAM REFERRAL (ACCEPTED)

6/5/2020: DIVERSIONARY PROGRAM REFERRAL (ACCEPTED)

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

5/20/2020: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

5/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

4/20/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

4/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/13/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

3/12/2020: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

2/13/2020: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

2/13/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

1/28/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

1/27/2020: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

1/19/2020: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

1/17/2020: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/21/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/21/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ADDENDUM TO ELECTRONIC ARREST REPORT

1/17/2020: ADDENDUM TO ELECTRONIC ARREST REPORT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER (STATE ANNOUNCED DROP NOTICE IN COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03(1)(a)1); Degree: 1; Level: M; Plea: No Plea Entered; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DISPOSITION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DIVERSIONARY PROGRAM REFERRAL (ACCEPTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ADDENDUM TO ELECTRONIC ARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/17/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM000114

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant