This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/05/2021 at 02:06:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PERDUE, JAMES SCOTT

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PERDUE, JAMES SCOTT. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. and MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0325

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PERDUE, JAMES SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

QUIMBY, MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

7/31/2020: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

7/2/2020: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

4/21/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

4/21/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

4/21/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/19/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/19/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/11/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/11/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

3/10/2020: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER

3/2/2020: ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

2/26/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

2/26/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/26/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

2/24/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

2/24/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/24/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOT OF APP, WAIV OF ARR, NG PLEA & DEMAND FOR TRIAL

2/21/2020: NOT OF APP, WAIV OF ARR, NG PLEA & DEMAND FOR TRIAL

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOLLE PROSEQUI ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online; Result: OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC BATTERY) (784.03.1a1); Degree: 1; Level: M; Disposition: Nolle Prossed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: Private Attorney Pre-Trial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOT OF APP, WAIV OF ARR, NG PLEA & DEMAND FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020MM000325, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. PERDUE, JAMES SCOTT WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS ABR-2/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020MM000325, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. PERDUE, JAMES SCOTT WITH 0 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM000325

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant