This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/04/2021 at 00:03:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PARMENTER, HAL MARK JR

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PARMENTER, HAL MARK JR. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0197

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PARMENTER, HAL MARK Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURCIA-BUSTOS, HECTOR

Defendant Attorney

SCHEMER, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

3/25/2020: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

3/19/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/19/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

3/6/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/6/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

2/4/2020: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/10/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/10/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

2/5/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Courtroom 11; Result: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: DRUGS-POSSESS - CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION (893.13(6)(a)); Degree: 3; Level: F; Disposition: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: MOVING TRAFFIC VIOL - DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSP 1ST OFF (322.34(2)(a)); Degree: 2; Level: M; Disposition: Transfer to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: TRANSFERRED TO 2020CT000636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Courtroom 11; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: ADD SENT TO TCATS - ACNYI3E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/04/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF000197

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURCIA-BUSTOS, HECTOR