This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 06/17/2022 at 16:03:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. NOLL, ADDISON THOMAS

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NOLL, ADDISON THOMAS. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0633

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

NOLL, ADDISON THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

5/20/2022: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER SETTING BOND

5/20/2022: ORDER SETTING BOND

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

5/20/2022: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

NOTICE TO APPEAR

5/24/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

JAIL MEMORANDUM

6/2/2022: JAIL MEMORANDUM

JUDGMENT FOR COSTS LETTER

6/3/2022: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS LETTER

PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

6/2/2022: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST

6/7/2022: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 6/16/2022 11:41 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022037378

6/12/2022: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 6/16/2022 11:41 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022037378

10 DAY COLLECTION LETTER

6/13/2022: 10 DAY COLLECTION LETTER

PAYMENT $425.50 RECEIPT #143294

6/15/2022: PAYMENT $425.50 RECEIPT #143294

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $425.50 RECEIPT #143294

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 10 DAY COLLECTION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 6/16/2022 11:41 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022037378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: DAMAGE PROP-CRIM MISCH - 200 DOLS AND UNDER (806.13(1)(b)1); Degree: 2; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JAIL MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/20/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022MM000633

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant