This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/23/2022 at 07:10:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MOSLEY, COURTNEY JAVONE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MOSLEY, COURTNEY JAVONE. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WILKINSON, GARY L and WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1156

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WILKINSON, GARY L

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MOSLEY, COURTNEY JEVONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARTUNG, LAURA

Defendant Attorney

PATTERSON, MELINDA R

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/17/2022: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER OF BOND

9/17/2022: ORDER OF BOND

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

9/17/2022: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

9/21/2022: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF APPEAR,WAIVE ARRAIGN,PLEA NG, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEAR,WAIVE ARRAIGN,PLEA NG, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

10/18/2022: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY

10/21/2022: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

11/1/2022: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: RESET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEAR,WAIVE ARRAIGN,PLEA NG, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: STATE'S DISCIVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: WILKINSON, GARY L; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/17/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CF001156

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patterson, Melinda