This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/17/2022 at 16:09:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MILLER, ROY ALLEN

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MILLER, ROY ALLEN. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0619

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MILLER, ROY ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURCIA-BUSTOS, HECTOR

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

SIMPSON, CHARLES

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

5/20/2022: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/20/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CF000619

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURCIA-BUSTOS, HECTOR