This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/22/2021 at 16:05:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MCLEOD, JASON MALCOLM

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCLEOD, JASON MALCOLM. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0101

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MCLEOD, JASON MALCOLM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/25/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ORDER OF BOND

1/25/2021: ORDER OF BOND

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

1/25/2021: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/25/2021: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

1/25/2021: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/25/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE- DEFD SIGNED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000101

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant