This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 10/15/2021 at 16:04:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LOUSTAU, NATHANIEL ROBERT

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LOUSTAU, NATHANIEL ROBERT. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1359

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LOUSTAU, NATHANIEL ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROSE, SANDRA L

 

Court Documents

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

9/20/2021: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

9/22/2021: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/21/2021: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: MARIJUANA-POSSESS - POSSESS MARIJUANA OVER 20 GRAMS (893.13(6)(a)); Degree: 3; Level: F; Disposition: Transfer to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: TRANSFERRED TO 2021MM001171

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF001359

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROSE, SANDRA L