This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 10/11/2021 at 16:04:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOSEPH, DIANE BIVONA

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOSEPH, DIANE BIVONA. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1142

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOSEPH, DIANE BIVONA

 

Court Documents

PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

10/7/2021: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

10/5/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

9/20/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

9/17/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

9/17/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: LARC - PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE 1ST OFFENSE (812.014(3)(a)); Degree: 2; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM001142

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant