This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/22/2021 at 16:06:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOHNSON, DUSTY MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, DUSTY MARIE. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0102

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

JOHNSON, MARIE MARIE

JOHNSON, DUSTY MARIE

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $752.00 RECEIPT #74844 FROM CASH BOND #000227

2/22/2021: PAYMENT $752.00 RECEIPT #74844 FROM CASH BOND #000227

RECEIPT # 71502 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

2/1/2021: RECEIPT # 71502 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/25/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $752.00 RECEIPT #74844 FROM CASH BOND #000227

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND 000227 (812.014(3)(A)) RELEASED ($752.00 REFUNDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Online; Result: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: LARC - PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE 1ST OFFENSE (812.014(3)(a)); Degree: 2; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/18/2021 10:16 AM / RECEPTION #: 2021010087

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT # 71502 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND FOR $752.00 ADDED TO CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND FOR $752.00 ADDED TO CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT FROM ANOTHER COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000102

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant