This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 17:01:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HUPP, TRAVIS MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 01/14/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against HUPP, TRAVIS MATTHEW. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0061

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HUPP, TRAVIS MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

1/14/2023: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/14/2023: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/14/2023: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/14/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ORDER OF BOND

1/14/2023: ORDER OF BOND

JAIL MEMORANDUM

2/7/2023: JAIL MEMORANDUM

PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

2/7/2023: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST

2/9/2023: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

2/9/2023: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/16/2023 1:53 PM / RECEPTION #: 2023007205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: DAMAGE PROP-CRIM MISCH - OVER 200 DOLS UNDER 1000 DOLS (806.13(1)(b)2); Degree: 1; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JAIL MEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/14/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023MM000061

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less