This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 11/24/2022 at 17:05:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GAUTHIER, TIMOTHY JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 09/25/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GAUTHIER, TIMOTHY JOSEPH. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1233

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GAUTHIER, TIMOTHY JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/25/2022: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

JAIL MEMORANDUM

9/25/2022: JAIL MEMORANDUM

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

9/25/2022: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

10 DAY COLLECTION LETTER

10/6/2022: 10 DAY COLLECTION LETTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 10 DAY COLLECTION LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COX, ANGELA M.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: DISORDERLY INTOX - DISORDER INTOX PUBLIC PLACE CAUSE DISTURBANCE (856.011); Degree: 2; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JAIL MEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/25/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022MM001233

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant