This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/04/2021 at 19:56:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GADSON, BRANDON ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 02/16/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GADSON, BRANDON ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0296

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GADSON, BRANDON ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAUGUSTINIS, RANDALL ANN

Defendant Attorney

COOKE, WILBER LEE II

 

Court Documents

ARREST WARRANT

2/16/2020: ARREST WARRANT

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

2/16/2020: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

SURETY BOND RELEASE

3/15/2020: SURETY BOND RELEASE

ORDER REVOKING BOND

3/15/2020: ORDER REVOKING BOND

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/11/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

3/11/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

2/17/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: CLAY COUNTY JAIL - 25,003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT FOR ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/16/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF000296

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAUGUSTINIS, RANDALL ANN