This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/11/2021 at 19:22:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FLEMING, AMY NICOLE

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FLEMING, AMY NICOLE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, TIMOTHY R., LESTER, DON H. and SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1130

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

LESTER, DON H.

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FLEMING, AMY NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURCIA-BUSTOS, HECTOR

Defendant Attorneys

SIMPSON, CHARLES

SCHEMER, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

8/3/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

8/10/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

SURETY BOND

8/7/2020: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

8/6/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION FILED

8/6/2020: INFORMATION FILED

ORDER OF BOND

8/3/2020: ORDER OF BOND

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

8/3/2020: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: CANCELLED W/O RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Chambers, Judge Sharrit; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Division C Chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CLAY COUNTY JAIL - 50,003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF001130

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant