This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 05/06/2023 at 07:10:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FAMEUX, CLAUDIN

Case Summary

On 01/14/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against FAMEUX, CLAUDIN. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0060

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FAMEUX, CLAUDIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCCREA, JACOB P

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF BOND

1/14/2023: ORDER OF BOND

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/14/2023: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

5/3/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

5/3/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

4/21/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

4/21/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

4/6/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

4/6/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

4/6/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

3/9/2023: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

3/9/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

3/9/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

2/8/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

2/8/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR

CASH BOND FOR $752.00 ADDED TO CASE

1/23/2023: CASH BOND FOR $752.00 ADDED TO CASE

CASH BOND POSTED

1/23/2023: CASH BOND POSTED

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCES

1/18/2023: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA NOT GUILTY/WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

1/17/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA NOT GUILTY/WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, REQUEST FOR A COPY OF CHARGE, WAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEREANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/14/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023MM000060

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less