This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 17:08:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DOWLING, CHARLIE T

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DOWLING, CHARLIE T. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2075

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DOWLING, CHARLIE TYRONE III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/13/2020 10:48 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020001973

1/13/2020: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/13/2020 10:48 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020001973

JUDGMENT FOR COSTS LETTER

12/27/2019: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS LETTER

COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

12/12/2019: COURT NOTICE OF RETURN DATE

PLEA OF GUILTY AND NEGOTIATED SENTENCE

12/12/2019: PLEA OF GUILTY AND NEGOTIATED SENTENCE

CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

12/12/2019: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

MEMO FROM JUDGE TO CHANGE BOND

11/28/2019: MEMO FROM JUDGE TO CHANGE BOND

ORDER REVOKING BOND

11/28/2019: ORDER REVOKING BOND

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/6/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

11/5/2019: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/4/2019: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

11/4/2019: MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

11/4/2019: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/13/2020 10:48 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020001973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT FOR COSTS LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03(1)(a)1); Degree: 1; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/27/2019 11:36 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019068381

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: MISDEMEANOR RAPE CRISIS TRUST FUND ASSESSED $151.00 DUE ON 3/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: MISDEMEANOR COURT COSTS ASSESSED $325.50 DUE ON 3/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: MISDEMEANOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SURCHARGE ASSESSED $201.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: CLAY COUNTY SHERIFF'S INVESTIGATIVE FUND FS 938.27(7) (D) ASSESSED $64.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/12/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019MM002075

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: CLAY COUNTY JAIL - NO BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MEMO FROM JUDGE TO CHANGE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER REVOKING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/04/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CF001658

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant