This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 11/29/2022 at 07:36:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DODGEN, ROY JAMES

Case Summary

On 09/17/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DODGEN, ROY JAMES. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WILKINSON, GARY L and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1190

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WILKINSON, GARY L

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DODGEN, ROY JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FLETCHER, W. CHARLES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/22/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/14/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

10/21/2022: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

INFORMATION FILED

10/5/2022: INFORMATION FILED

SURETY BOND RELEASE

10/14/2022: SURETY BOND RELEASE

JAIL MEMORANDUM

10/14/2022: JAIL MEMORANDUM

ORDER REVOKING BOND

10/14/2022: ORDER REVOKING BOND

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

10/11/2022: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/11/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/6/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

9/28/2022: MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

9/26/2022: RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

9/20/2022: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

9/28/2022: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

9/17/2022: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: WILKINSON, GARY L; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/17/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022MM001190

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fletcher, W Charles