This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 10/15/2021 at 16:04:09 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DEL RIO, MADELINE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DEL RIO, MADELINE. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1134

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DEL RIO, MADELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR

9/27/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

9/17/2021: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

NOTICE TO APPEAR

9/17/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ORDER SETTING BOND

9/17/2021: ORDER SETTING BOND

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/17/2021: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM001134

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant