This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 05:10:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CERGE, CHELSEA NICOLE

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CERGE, CHELSEA NICOLE. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. and FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1439

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CERGE, CHELSEA NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ZIMA, REBECCA NIKIRK

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/7/2022: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/7/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

11/7/2022: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

11/7/2022: MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

11/7/2022: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA NOT GUILTY/WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

11/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA NOT GUILTY/WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

11/21/2022: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/22/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/22/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/22/2022: ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr; Location: Courtroom 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA NOT GUILTY/WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022MM001439

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less