This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/28/2023 at 15:02:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BURKETT, AARON LORENZO JR

Case Summary

On 01/14/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BURKETT, AARON LORENZO JR. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0057

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BURKETT, AARON LORENZO JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANVANESOV, VALERIY

Defendant Attorney

ROZAS, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/14/2023: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER OF BOND

1/14/2023: ORDER OF BOND

CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

1/20/2023: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

SURETY BOND RELEASE

1/20/2023: SURETY BOND RELEASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: DRUG EQUIP-POSSESS - POSSESS AND OR USE DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (893.147(1)); Degree: 1; Level: M; Disposition: Dropped

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: COCAINE-POSSESS - POSSESS COCAINE (893.13(6)(a)); Degree: 3; Level: F; Disposition: Dropped

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • ChargeCount: 3; Description: DRIV WHILE LIC SUSPENED REVOCATION EQUIV STATUS (322.34(2)(a)); Degree: 2; Level: M; Disposition: Transfer to Another Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: TRANSFERRED TO 2023CT000133

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEntry: CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AGQ5FXE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: CITATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/14/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CF000057

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less