This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/24/2022 at 17:07:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BOYLEN, STEVEN WESLEY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOYLEN, STEVEN WESLEY. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1185

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BOYLEN, STEVEN WESLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/25/2022: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

9/25/2022: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: OUT OF STATE FUG (941.02); Degree: N; Level: N; Plea: No Plea; Disposition: Extradited

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: CANCELLED W/O RESETTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.; Location: Courtroom 12; Result: RESET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF EXTRADITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COX, ANGELA M.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/25/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CF001185

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant