This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 00:42:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BORNTRAEGER, MADALYN RENEE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BORNTRAEGER, MADALYN RENEE. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0091

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BORNTRAEGER, MADALYN RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

COOKE, WILBER LEE II

NICHOLS, EUGENE B

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $288.00 RECEIPT #26425

3/2/2020: PAYMENT $288.00 RECEIPT #26425

ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY

2/28/2020: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

2/27/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 3/2/2020 12:11 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020011215

2/27/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 3/2/2020 12:11 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020011215

NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

1/22/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

1/14/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/13/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/13/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

1/9/2020: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

12/31/2019: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

12/31/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/30/2019: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

12/27/2019: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $288.00 RECEIPT #26425

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: DRUG ABUSE TRUST FUND MM ASSESSED $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: MISDEMEANOR COURT COSTS ASSESSED $273.00 DUE ON 6/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: MARIJUANA-POSSESS - NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS (893.13(6)(b)); Degree: 1; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: DRUG EQUIP-POSSESS - POSSESS AND OR USE DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (893.147(1)); Degree: 1; Level: M; Disposition: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 3/2/2020 12:11 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020011215

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM000091

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/27/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CF001519

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOKE, WILBER LEE II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nichols, Eugene Bullard