This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 03/31/2021 at 16:12:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BLOT, SHIMELL DE'QUANTE MONKE

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BLOT, SHIMELL DE'QUANTE MONKE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. and LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0293

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BLOT, SHIMELL DE'QUANTE MONKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONA, JAMIE V

Defendant Attorneys

COOKE, WILBER LEE II

ADAMS-JONES, SISSY

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF BOND

3/2/2021: ORDER OF BOND

CITATION FILED

3/2/2021: CITATION FILED

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

3/2/2021: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester; Result: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: EVIDENCE-DESTROYING - TAMPER WITH OR FABRICATE PHYSICAL (918.13); Degree: 3; Level: F; Disposition: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: MARIJUANA-POSSESS - NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS (893.13(6)(b)); Degree: 1; Level: M; Disposition: Transfer to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • ChargeCount: 3; Description: MOTOR VEHICLE/MOBILE HOME Expired registration 6 months or less Note 29 (320.07(3)(a)); Level: I; Disposition: Transfer to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • ChargeCount: 4; Description: OPEN CONTAINER/OR CONSUMPTION of ALCOHOL IN/ON VEHICLE (Driver cited) (316.1936); Level: I; Disposition: Transfer to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: CHANGE OF CHARGE TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: TRANSFERRED TO 2021MM000249

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PRIVATE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: ADD SENT TO TCATS - AE57SPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: ADD SENT TO TCATS - AE57SOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/02/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000293

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONA, JAMIE V