This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 23:16:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BEASON, KEITH DAVID

Case Summary

On 01/12/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BEASON, KEITH DAVID. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0079

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BEASON, KEITH DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION/SUCCESSFUL

7/1/2020: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION/SUCCESSFUL

PAYMENT $42.00 RECEIPT #39101

6/12/2020: PAYMENT $42.00 RECEIPT #39101

PAYMENT $240.00 RECEIPT #34093

5/1/2020: PAYMENT $240.00 RECEIPT #34093

PAYMENT $240.00 RECEIPT #30780

3/31/2020: PAYMENT $240.00 RECEIPT #30780

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

1/13/2020: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

PAYMENT $80.00 RECEIPT #27270

3/6/2020: PAYMENT $80.00 RECEIPT #27270

PAYMENT $123.00 RECEIPT #22187

2/6/2020: PAYMENT $123.00 RECEIPT #22187

SURETY BOND RELEASE

1/27/2020: SURETY BOND RELEASE

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/3/2020 11:53 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020005779

1/27/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE MISDEMEANOR - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/3/2020 11:53 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020005779

PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

1/27/2020: PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE

ADDENDUM TO ELECTRONIC ARREST REPORT

1/15/2020: ADDENDUM TO ELECTRONIC ARREST REPORT

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/15/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

1/15/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/15/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

1/14/2020: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR

1/14/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

1/14/2020: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

SURETY BOND

1/14/2020: SURETY BOND

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION/SUCCESSFUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $42.00 RECEIPT #39101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $240.00 RECEIPT #34093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $240.00 RECEIPT #30780

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $80.00 RECEIPT #27270

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $123.00 RECEIPT #22187

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: TRANSFERRED TO 2020PB000061

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03(1)(a)1); Degree: 1; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: DAMAGE PROP-CRIM MISCH - 200 DOLS AND UNDER (806.13(1)(b)1); Degree: 2; Level: M; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTIF TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ADDENDUM TO ELECTRONIC ARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/12/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM000079

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant