This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/19/2023 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ALLY, MALIK MUHAMMAD

Case Summary

On 02/26/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ALLY, MALIK MUHAMMAD. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LESTER, DON H. and MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0223

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LESTER, DON H.

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ALLY, MALIK MUHAMMAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAUGUSTINIS, RANDALL ANN

Defendant Attorney

COOKE, WILBER LEE II

 

Court Documents

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

2/26/2023: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER OF BOND

2/26/2023: ORDER OF BOND

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

2/27/2023: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

2/26/2023: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

VICTIM NOTIFICATION

2/26/2023: VICTIM NOTIFICATION

ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

2/26/2023: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/1/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SURETY BOND

3/1/2023: SURETY BOND

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/6/2023: RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingEvent: Review; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Courtroom 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE - NO CONTACT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CF000223

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less