This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 11/24/2022 at 17:06:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. AGEE, KENNETH VALENTINO

Case Summary

On 09/25/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against AGEE, KENNETH VALENTINO. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1232

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

AGEE, KENNETH VALENTINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR

9/25/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/25/2022: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/18/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

DISPOSITION NOTICE

11/3/2022: DISPOSITION NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: MEMORANDUM FROM STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AMENDED DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • HearingEvent: Pretrial; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC BATTERY) (784.03.1a1); Degree: 1; Level: M; Plea: No Plea Entered; Disposition: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DISPOSITION NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: Arraignment; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2; Result: NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: Bond Hearing; Judge: COX, ANGELA M.; Location: Online

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: MEMO TO CCSO FROM JUDGE ROR DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: VICTIM LETHALITY ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/25/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022MM001232

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant